California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1996 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016