LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1996
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1996
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1996
Compare Versions
AB1996 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB1996 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1996 Amended June 15, 2016
AB1996 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1996 Amended March 15, 2016
AB1996 Introduced February 16, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1996 Enrolled September 2, 2016
AB1996 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1996 Amended June 15, 2016
AB1996 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1996 Amended March 15, 2016
AB1996 Introduced February 16, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare