|
09/22/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 319, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 3210.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2631.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 1382.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|