California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill June 16, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015