Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Reconsideration of a favorable vote granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 2. Page 1917.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/01/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|