LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB20
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB20
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB20
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 1, 2014
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 17, 2015
Compare
Bill
July 14, 2015
Compare
Bill
July 1, 2015
Compare
Bill
June 2, 2015
Compare
Bill
April 30, 2015
Compare
Bill
March 26, 2015
Compare