Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 11). | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2016 | Read first time. To print. |