California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2014 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/13/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2014AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Melendez FEBRUARY 16, 2016 An act to add Sections 2566 and 2566.1 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2014, as amended, Melendez. Freeway Service Patrol Program Assessment. The Freeway Service Patrol Act authorizes and provides funding for freeway service patrols, operated pursuant to an agreement between the Department of the California Highway Patrol, the Department of Transportation, and a regional or local governmental entity, on traffic-congested urban freeways throughout the state. This bill would, by June 20, 2018, and every 5 years thereafter, require the Department of Transportation to publish and submit to the Legislature and the Department of Finance, as specified, a statewide Freeway Service Patrol Program Assessment that would, among other things, identify, quantify, and analyze existing freeway service patrols, identify opportunities to increase or expand service levels, and analyze and provide recommendations regarding the current and anticipated future financial condition of the program, as specified. The bill would require the state budget to include a line item identifying the amount of local assistance moneys and state operations moneys  that were  provided in support of freeway service patrols. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2566 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 2566. (a) By June 20, 2018, and every five years thereafter, the department, in coordination with the Department of the California Highway Patrol and regional and local entities, shall publish a statewide Freeway Service Patrol Program Assessment. The program assessment shall do all of the following: (1) Identify, quantify, and analyze existing freeway service patrols, and identify opportunities to increase or expand service levels. (2) Analyze and provide recommendations regarding the current and anticipated future financial condition of the program, accounting for various factors, including, but not limited to, operation costs, available funding, and state personnel resources.  (3) Include, as attachments, supporting data provided to the department by regional and local entities and by the Department of the California Highway Patrol.   (3)   (4)  Examine all of the following: (A) The financial sustainability of maintaining current freeway service patrols. (B) The route miles unserved or underserved by freeway service patrols. (C) Historical, current, and future state and local funding for freeway service patrols.  (4)   (5)  Analyze and quantify the public benefits received or to be received from existing and potential new freeway service patrols.  (5)  (6)  Discuss how freeway service patrols relate to other state policies, plans, and goals. (b) The department shall submit the program assessment to the Legislature, in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code, and to the Department of Finance, and shall include a recommendation regarding the state moneys necessary to fund the recommendations identified in the program assessment. SEC. 2. Section 2566.1 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read: 2566.1. The state budget shall include a line item for the department and the Department of the California Highway Patrol to identify the amount of local assistance moneys and state operations moneys provided in support of freeway service patrols.