Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2016 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2016 | Read first time. To print. |