|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 496, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6538.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5414.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4679.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 4554.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|