California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2024 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill May 23, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016