|
08/19/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 143, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 5698.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4648.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 4780.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|