California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2030 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 19, 2016

Amended

Bill June 1, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016