California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2051 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016