LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2051
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2051
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2051
Compare Versions
AB2051 Chaptered August 25, 2016
AB2051 Enrolled August 16, 2016
AB2051 Amended August 2, 2016
AB2051 Amended June 13, 2016
AB2051 Amended April 4, 2016
AB2051 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2051 Chaptered August 25, 2016
AB2051 Enrolled August 16, 2016
AB2051 Amended August 2, 2016
AB2051 Amended June 13, 2016
AB2051 Amended April 4, 2016
AB2051 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare