Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 25. Page 5251.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 7.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|