California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2079 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016