Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 4950.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4887.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|