LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2082
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2082
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2082
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 17, 2016
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 22, 2016
Compare
Bill
May 23, 2016
Compare
Bill
April 13, 2016
Compare
Bill
March 17, 2016
Compare