|
09/29/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 7. Page 6377.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5276.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5046.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Mitchell. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5051.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 4678.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 3.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|