California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2089 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016