|
09/26/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6292.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 5230.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4900.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|