California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2115 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 11, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016