California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2133 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Amended

Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016