LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2133
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2133
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2133
Compare Versions
AB2133 Amended June 16, 2016
AB2133 Amended May 31, 2016
AB2133 Amended April 12, 2016
AB2133 Amended April 5, 2016
AB2133 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2133 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2133 Amended June 16, 2016
AB2133 Amended May 31, 2016
AB2133 Amended April 12, 2016
AB2133 Amended April 5, 2016
AB2133 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2133 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare