California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2137 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill May 27, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016