BILL NUMBER: AB 2137CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 226 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 29, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 29, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 15, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Santiago FEBRUARY 17, 2016 An act to add and repeal Section 66721.9 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2137, Santiago. Postsecondary education: University of California: student transfers. Existing law establishes the University of California, under the administration of the Regents of the University of California, and the California Community Colleges, under the administration of the Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges, as 2 of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law requests the University of California to continue its examination of articulation of lower division major prerequisites in high-demand transfer majors with a goal of working in collaboration with the California Community Colleges to design community college transfer degrees that provide students adequate preparation for entry into a major. Existing law also requests the University of California to consider and implement other specified actions to increase transfer between the university and the California Community Colleges. This bill would request the regents to submit annual reports, on or before March 1 in each year from 2017 to 2022, inclusive, on specified topics relating to community college student transfers to the University of California. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66721.9 is added to the Education Code, to read: 66721.9. (a) The Regents of the University of California are hereby requested to submit an annual report to the Legislature, in accordance with Section 9795 of the Government Code, on or before March 1 in each year from 2017 to 2022, inclusive, on all of the following: (1) (A) The number of students who reported to the University of California on their admissions application that they received an associate degree for transfer and who were granted admission to the University of California, along with the average community college grade point average of these students, broken down by University of California campus. (B) The admissions rate and yield rate for students who reported to the University of California on their admissions application that they received an associate degree for transfer, broken down by University of California campus. (C) The number of students who reported to the University of California on their admissions application that they received an associate degree for transfer and who enrolled at the University of California, along with the average community college grade point average of these students, broken down by University of California campus. (D) The number of students who reported to the University of California on their admissions application that they received an associate degree for transfer and who graduated from the University of California within two or three academic years for the cohort graduating in the year of the report, broken down by University of California campus. (2) (A) The number of students who used the transfer admission guarantee and who were granted admission to the University of California, along with the average community college grade point average of these students, broken down by University of California campus. (B) The admissions rate and yield rate for students who used the transfer admission guarantee, broken down by University of California campus. (C) The number of students who used the transfer admission guarantee and who enrolled at the University of California, along with the average community college grade point average of these students, broken down by University of California campus. (D) The number of students who used the transfer admission guarantee and who graduated from the University of California within two or three academic years for the cohort graduating in the year of the report, broken down by University of California campus. (b) Beginning on or before March 1, 2019, the annual report to the Legislature pursuant to subdivision (a) is requested to include all of the following: (1) The number of students who used a UC Transfer Pathway and who were granted admission to the University of California, along with the average community college grade point average of these students, broken down by University of California campus. (2) The admissions rate and yield rate for students who used a UC Transfer Pathway, broken down by University of California campus. (3) The number of students who used a UC Transfer Pathway who enrolled at the University of California, along with the average community college grade point average of these students, broken down by University of California campus. (4) The number of students who used a UC Transfer Pathway and who graduated from the University of California within two or three academic years for the cohort graduating in the year of the report, broken down by University of California campus. (c) To the extent that the University of California has this information, each category reported pursuant to this section is requested to be broken down by student ethnicity. (d) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2024.