|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 262, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6043.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4982.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4725.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|