California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2138 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill August 10, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016