California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2139 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/28/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2139AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Williams FEBRUARY 17, 2016 An act to  amend Section 13170.3 of the Water Code, relating to water   quality.   add Section 35618 to the Public Resources Code, relating to ocean resources.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2139, as amended, Williams.  State Water Resources Control Board: California Ocean Plan.   Ocean Protection Council: ocean acidification.   Existing law establishes the Ocean Protection Council in state government and prescribes the membership, functions, and duties of the council with regard to the protection and conservation of ocean and coastal resources.   This bill would require the council to facilitate research and compile data on the causes and effects of ocean acidification and, no later than January 1, 2018, to adopt recommendations for further legislative and executive actions to address ocean acidification.   Under the Porter-Cologne Water Quality Control Act, the State Water Resources Control Board and the 9 California regional water quality control boards are the principal state agencies with responsibility for the coordination and control of water quality in the state. The act requires the state board to formulate and adopt state policies for water quality control and to formulate and adopt, and review at least every 3 years, a water quality control plan for the ocean waters of the state known as the California Ocean Plan.   This bill would require the state board, on or before January 1, 2018, to either amend the plan or adopt separate standards to address water quality objectives and effluent limitations that specifically relate to carbon dioxide and pH levels within the state's coastal waters.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION   1.   Section 35618 is added to the   Public Resources Code   , to read:   35618. The council shall facilitate research and compile data on the causes and effects of ocean acidification and, no later than January 1, 2018, shall adopt recommendations for further legislative and executive actions to address ocean acidification.   SECTION 1.   Section 13170.3 of the Water Code is amended to read: 13170.3. (a) On or before January 1, 2013, the state board shall either amend the California Ocean Plan or adopt separate standards to address water quality objectives and effluent limitations that are specifically appropriate to brackish groundwater treatment system facilities that produce municipal water supplies for local use. (b) On or before January 1, 2018, the state board shall either amend the plan or adopt separate standards to address water quality objectives and effluent limitations that specifically relate to carbon dioxide and pH levels within the state's coastal waters.