LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2139
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2139
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2139
Compare Versions
AB2139 Chaptered September 14, 2016
AB2139 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2139 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2139 Amended August 2, 2016
AB2139 Amended June 20, 2016
AB2139 Amended May 31, 2016
AB2139 Amended March 28, 2016
AB2139 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2139 Chaptered September 14, 2016
AB2139 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2139 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2139 Amended August 2, 2016
AB2139 Amended June 20, 2016
AB2139 Amended May 31, 2016
AB2139 Amended March 28, 2016
AB2139 Introduced February 17, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare