California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016