California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB215 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 2, 2015

Amended

Bill June 2, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015