LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB215
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB215
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB215
Compare Versions
AB215 Chaptered September 2, 2015
AB215 Enrolled August 19, 2015
AB215 Amended June 2, 2015
AB215 Amended May 4, 2015
AB215 Amended April 6, 2015
AB215 Introduced February 2, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB215 Chaptered September 2, 2015
AB215 Enrolled August 19, 2015
AB215 Amended June 2, 2015
AB215 Amended May 4, 2015
AB215 Amended April 6, 2015
AB215 Introduced February 2, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare