|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 769, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2667.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2145.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1259.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|