California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB216 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill June 29, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015