|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 691, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6453.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5369.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4770.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2016
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|