California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2176 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 3, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill April 28, 2016
Bill April 19, 2016