California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2190 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016