|
09/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 460, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6192.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5119.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 5166.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5177.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5075.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 1.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4218.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|