LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2208
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2208
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2208
Compare Versions
AB2208 Chaptered September 22, 2016
AB2208 Enrolled August 26, 2016
AB2208 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2208 Amended June 23, 2016
AB2208 Amended June 1, 2016
AB2208 Amended April 4, 2016
AB2208 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2208 Chaptered September 22, 2016
AB2208 Enrolled August 26, 2016
AB2208 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2208 Amended June 23, 2016
AB2208 Amended June 1, 2016
AB2208 Amended April 4, 2016
AB2208 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare