|
08/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 246, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 4963.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 10. Page 4768.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4719.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|