California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2228 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 17, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 30, 2016

Amended

Bill May 9, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016