Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 5220.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5220.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5237.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 5238.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4448.) In committee: Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|