California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2243 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill June 2, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016