|
07/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 75, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4648.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4500.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|