California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2252 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 22, 2016

Amended

Bill April 20, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016