California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2257 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill June 22, 2016
Bill May 11, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016