|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 881, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 4964.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4956.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4887.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|