LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2263
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2263
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2263
Compare Versions
AB2263 Chaptered September 30, 2016
AB2263 Enrolled August 17, 2016
AB2263 Amended May 23, 2016
AB2263 Amended April 11, 2016
AB2263 Amended March 30, 2016
AB2263 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2263 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2263 Chaptered September 30, 2016
AB2263 Enrolled August 17, 2016
AB2263 Amended May 23, 2016
AB2263 Amended April 11, 2016
AB2263 Amended March 30, 2016
AB2263 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2263 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare